GA HB929 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 8 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to solid waste management, so as to provide for post-closure ground-water monitoring at closed coal combustion residual impoundments; to amend Part 3 of Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to criminal trespass and damage to property relative to waste control, so as to provide for a conforming cross-reference; to amend Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to county special purpose local option sales tax; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Solid waste management; post-closure ground-water monitoring at closed coal combustion residual impoundments; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Vance Smith [R] | Rep. Dale Washburn [R] | Rep. Timothy Barr [R] | Rep. Lynn Smith [R] |
Rep. Robert Dickey [R] | Rep. Susan Holmes [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #577 (Y: 113 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57345 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/189811 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57345#17624 |