GA HB93 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-20 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-20 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to control of water pollution and surface-water use, so as to provide notice to local governing authorities prior to the dewatering of coal combustion residual surface impoundments; to provide for minimum notice requirements to the public of such dewatering; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Water pollution and surface-water use; notice to local governing authorities prior to the dewatering of coal combustion residual surface impoundments; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Ricky Williams [R] | Rep. Don Hogan [R] | Rep. William Werkheiser [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Steven Meeks [R] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #581 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-30 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House Hopper |