GA HB936 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to provide for the issuance, use, and display of drivers' licenses and identification cards in electronic format; to provide for definitions; to provide for standards for issuance of drivers' licenses and personal identification cards; to provide that display of an electronic driver's license or identification card does not equate to consent to a search of a person's wireless telecommunications device; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; issuance, use, and display of drivers' licenses and identification cards in electronic format; provide
Sponsors
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Jason Ridley [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Dave Belton [R] |
Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House Hopper |