GA HB937 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 8 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to buildings and housing, so as to provide for local governments to regulate certain building products and construction practices for single-family dwellings in a manner that is consistent with the codes and standards approved by the state; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; regulate certain building products and construction practices for single-family dwellings; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Vance Smith [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Jason Ridley [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] |
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Philip Singleton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57360 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/189968 |