GA HB943 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of Oakwood to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Oakwood, City of; levy an excise tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #638 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Vote #479 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Vote #479 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-30 | Act 460 | |
2020-06-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House Hopper |