GA HB949 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenue and taxation, so as to define the terms "Internal Revenue Code" and "Internal Revenue Code of 1986" and thereby incorporate certain provisions of the federal law into Georgia law; to provide an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; define "Internal Revenue Code" and "Internal Revenue Code of 1986" and thereby incorporate certain provisions of the federal law into Georgia law; define the terms
Sponsors
Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] |
Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House Vote #558 (Y: 100 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-24 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House Hopper |