GA HB954 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to theft, so as to provide for the crime of theft by possession of stolen mail; to provide for the crime of porch piracy; to provide for definitions; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and offenses; provide for the crime of theft by possession of stolen mail

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-21HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-20HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-19HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback