GA HB962 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 50-5-51 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to power, authority, and duty of the department of administrative services, so as to provide new authority for the department to enter into or authorize agreements with private for profit organizations; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Administrative Services, Department of; new authority to enter into or authorize agreements with private for profit organizations; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Todd Jones [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] |
Rep. Patty Stinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-20 | House | House Hopper |