GA HR1 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION naming the forthcoming new state appellate judicial complex the "Nathan Deal Judicial Center"; and for other purposes.
Title
Nathan Deal Judicial Center; naming the forthcoming new state appellate judicial complex
Sponsors
Rep. David Ralston [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] |
Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #48 (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Vote #15 (Y: 159 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Vote #15 (Y: 159 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 304 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-02-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-01-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-15 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-14 | House | House Hopper |
2018-11-15 | House | House Prefiled |