GA HR1023 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to provide that the people of this state may petition the judiciary for declaratory relief from certain acts of this state or certain local governments or officers or employees thereof that violate the laws or Constitution of this state or the Constitution of the United States; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Judiciary; people may petition for declaratory relief from certain acts of this state or certain local governments or officers or employees; provide - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Robert Trammell [D] |
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - House - House Vote #651 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #639 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Vote #469 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #639 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Vote #469 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-05 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 596 | |
2020-08-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-16 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-02-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-30 | House | House Hopper |