GA HR1037 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Georgia so as to provide the General Assembly with the power to regulate and fix charges owned or operated by a municipality of this state for services rendered outside of the municipality but inside the county in which the municipality is located; to provide for submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; services rendered outside of municipality but inside county; provide General Assembly with power to regulate and fix charges - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Don Parsons [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Sen. Josh McLaurin [D] |
Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-03 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57161 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/189245 |