GA HR1093 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Study Committee on Cybersecurity; and for other purposes.
Title
Joint Study Committee on Cybersecurity; create
Sponsors
Rep. Don Parsons [R] | Rep. William Werkheiser [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Randy Nix [R] |
Rep. Robert Dickey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House Hopper |