GA HR1167 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION authorizing the conveyance of certain state owned real property located in Glynn County; authorizing the lease of certain state owned real property located in Gordon County; authorizing the conveyance of certain state owned real property located in Muscogee County; authorizing the conveyance and lease of certain state owned real property located in Paulding County; authorizing the conveyance of certain state owned real property located in Rabun County; authorizing the conveyance of certain state owned real property located in Terrell County; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Property; conveyance of certain state owned real property; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. Emory Dunahoo [R] | Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] | Rep. William Werkheiser [R] |
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Sen. Bill Heath [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #777 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #771 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Vote #534 (Y: 165 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #771 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Vote #534 (Y: 165 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-05 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 602 | |
2020-08-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-07-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-19 | House | House Hopper |