GA HR135 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging Congress to eliminate the five-month waiting period for disability insurance benefits for individuals living with amyotrophic lateral sclerosis (ALS); and for other purposes.
Title
Congress; eliminate five-month waiting period for disability insurance benefits for individuals living with amyotrophic lateral sclerosis (ALS); urge
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Robert Trammell [D] | Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Rep. Lynn Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Vote #229 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-05 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54543 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/180319 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54543#16868 |