GA HR1350 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the President of the United States and Congress to enact legislation requiring the Food and Drug Administration to establish GMP standards regulating industrial hemp products with tetrahydrocannabinol content below 0.3 percent, including establishing a safe daily level of cannabidiol consumption by consumers; and for other purposes.
Title
President of the United States and Congress; enact legislation requiring the Food and Drug Administration to establish GMP standards regulating industrial hemp products with tetrahydrocannabinol content below 0.3 percent; urge
Sponsors
Rep. Vernon Jones [D] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-02 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/57971 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/191711 |