GA HR164 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to authorize the General Assembly to provide by general law for the dedication of revenues derived from fees or taxes to the public purpose for which such fees or taxes were imposed; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for the redesignation of a current subparagraph of the Constitution; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
General Assembly; dedication of revenues derived from fees or taxes to the public purpose for which such fees or taxes were imposed; authorize - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Rep. Robert Trammell [D] | Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] | Sen. William Ligon [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #560 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Vote #520 (Y: 164 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #246 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Vote #46 (Y: 169 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Vote #520 (Y: 164 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #246 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Vote #46 (Y: 169 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-05 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 597 | |
2020-08-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2020-03-03 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-07 | House | House Hopper |