GA HR2 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION ratifying the amendment to the Constitution of the United States prohibiting the use of poll taxes; and for other purposes.
Title
Constitution of the United States; prohibit use of poll taxes; ratify amendment
Sponsors
Rep. Scot Turner [R] | Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] | Rep. Steve Tarvin [R] | Rep. Heath Clark [R] |
Rep. Philip Singleton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-17 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-16 | House | House Hopper |
2018-11-15 | House | House Prefiled |