GA HR214 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION reauthorizing the House Rural Development Council; and for other purposes.
Title
House Rural Development Council; reauthorize
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. David Ralston [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] |
Rep. Patty Stinson [D] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House Vote #81 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-13 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54937 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/181351 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/54937#16604 |