GA HR261 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-22 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-22 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Study Committee on Evaluating and Simplifying Physician Oversight of Midlevel Providers; and for other purposes.
Title
Joint Study Committee on Evaluating and Simplifying Physician Oversight of Midlevel Providers; create
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] |
Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. Shelly Hutchinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - House - House Vote #273 (Y: 161 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-19 | House | House Hopper |