GA HR329 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Homeowners' Associations, Condominium Owners' Associations, and Property Owners in Community Associations; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Homeowners' Associations, Condominium Owners' Associations, and Property Owners in Community Associations; create
Sponsors
Rep. William Boddie [D] | Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] | Rep. Roger Bruce [D] | Rep. Derrick Jackson [D] |
Rep. Kimberly Alexander [D] | Rep. Marie Metze [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/55356 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/182528 |