GA HR368 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION urging the construction of Interstate 14; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interstate 14; construction; urge

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - House Vote #256 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-21HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-26HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback