GA HR378 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to provide that all forms of betting, bingo games, raffles, and gambling shall be permitted as determined by the Georgia Gaming Commission; to provide for the establishment of such commission; to provide for the members of such commission; to provide for powers, duties, responsibilities, and resources of such commission; to provide for related matters; to provide for submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Gaming Commission; all forms of betting, bingo games, raffles, and gambling shall be permitted; provide - CA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-26 | House | House Hopper |