GA HR447 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION recognizing and finding that pornography is a public health crisis leading to a broad spectrum of individual and public health impacts and societal harms; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pornography; public health crisis leading to broad spectrum of individual and public health impacts and societal harms; recognize

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-03HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback