GA HR51 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Veto V14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Georgia-North Carolina and Georgia-Tennessee Boundary Line Commission; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Georgia-North Carolina and Georgia-Tennessee Boundary Line Commission; create

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #404 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Vote #34 (Y: 163 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Veto V14
2019-05-10HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-11HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-04-02SenateSenate Third Read
2019-04-02SenateSenate Taken from Table
2019-03-29SenateSenate Tabled
2019-03-07SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-05SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-14HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-02-14HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-01-30HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-29HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback