GA HR585 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Gang and Youth Violence Prevention; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Gang and Youth Violence Prevention; create
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Gilliard [D] | Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. Dewayne Hill [R] | Rep. Noel Williams [R] |
Rep. Erick Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #352 (Y: 147 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-22 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56063 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/185343 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56063#17122 |