GA HR6 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to provide term limits for members of the Senate and members of the House of Representatives; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Senate and House of Representatives; members; provide term limits - CA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House Hopper |
2018-12-28 | House | House Prefiled |