GA HR646 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION encouraging the Georgia Legislature to broaden eligibility and increase funding for the Breast and Cervical Cancer Prevention Program; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Legislature; broaden eligibility and increase funding for the Breast and Cervical Cancer Prevention Program; encourage
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Rep. Mack Jackson [D] |
Rep. Jan Tankersley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-25 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-22 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56175 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/185644 |