GA HR7 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to authorize the General Assembly to provide for the proceeds of one or more lottery games to benefit homeless military veterans; to provide for authorized purposes; to provide for appropriations; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
General Assembly; proceeds of one or more lottery games to benefit homeless military veterans; authorize - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] | Rep. Sharon Beasley-Teague [D] | Rep. Sheila Nelson [D] |
Rep. Rhonda Burnough [D] | Rep. Park Cannon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-28 | House | House Hopper |
2019-01-08 | House | House Prefiled |