GA SB106 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 4 of Title 49 and Title 33 of the O.C.G.A., relating to medical assistance and insurance, respectively, so as to authorize the Department of Community Health to submit a Section 1115 waiver request to the United States Department of Health and Human Services Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services; to authorize the Governor to submit a Section 1332 innovation waiver proposal to the United States Secretaries of Health and Human Services and the Treasury; to provide for implementation of approved Section 1332 waivers; to provide for expiration of authority; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to provide for a short title; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Patients First Act"
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Tillery [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Rep. Jodi Lott [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #288 (Y: 104 N: 67 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #60 (Y: 35 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #65 (Y: 32 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #60 (Y: 35 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #65 (Y: 32 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Effective Date | |
2019-03-27 | Act 4 | |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hopper |