GA SB11 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to tax returns and furnishing of information, so as to authorize Georgia taxpayers to make certain voluntary contributions through the income tax payment and refund process to aid and assist service disabled veterans through a qualified service disabled veterans benefit organization; to provide for definitions; to provide for conditions and limitations; to provide for the promulgation of rules and regulations; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Senator Jack Hill Veterans Act"; enact
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Senate Prefiled |