GA SB115 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 34 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the "Medical Practice Act of the State of Georgia," so as to provide for telemedicine licenses for physicians licensed in other states to engage in the practice of medicine with patients in this state through telemedicine; to provide for requirements for issuance of a telemedicine license; to provide for restrictions; to provide for notice of restrictions placed on a license by another state; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for revocation; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Medical Practice Act of the State of Georgia"; telemedicine licenses for physicians in other states; engage in the practice of medicine with patients in this state through telemedicine; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] |
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #333 (Y: 161 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #352 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #63 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #352 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #63 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 156 | |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |