GA SB122 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 22 of Chapter 1 of Title 10 of the O.C.G.A., relating to motor vehicle franchise practices, so as to provide for protection of certain consumer data in motor vehicle sales or lease transactions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor Vehicle Franchise Practices; protection of certain consumer data in motor vehicle sales or lease transactions; provide
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] |
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #368 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Vote #249 (Y: 158 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #115 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Vote #249 (Y: 158 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #115 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 157 | |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |