GA SB131 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 6 of the O.C.G.A., relating to aviation, so as to create the Georgia Major Airport Authority; to amend Article 1 of Chapter 15 of Title 45 of the O.C.G.A., to general provisions relative to the Attorney General, so as to provide for representation of the Georgia Major Airport Authority by the Attorney General; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

'Georgia Major Airport Authority Act'

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - House Vote #323 (Y: 104 N: 70 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #140 (Y: 21 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #141 (Y: 20 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #142 (Y: 21 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #143 (Y: 20 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #144 (Y: 21 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #145 (Y: 21 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #146 (Y: 35 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #147 (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-08HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-07SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-07SenateSenate Third Read
2019-02-28SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-20SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-19SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20192020/SB/131
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/181853.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/182978.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/184077.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/186344.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16828
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16827
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16826
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16825
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16824
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16823
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16822
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16821
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17053

Bill Comments

feedback