GA SB133 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 14 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Education Coordinating Council, so as to provide for the establishment of the Opportunity School District; to provide for conforming amendments; to provide for related matters; to provide for contingent effectiveness; to provide for automatic repeal under certain conditions; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Opportunity School District; establishment; provide for definitions; supervision of public elementary and secondary schools that are failing
Sponsors
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] | Sen. Freddie Sims [D] |
Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #261 (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Vote #302 (Y: 108 N: 53 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #86 (Y: 16 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #87 (Y: 16 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #88 (Y: 16 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #89 (Y: 14 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #90 (Y: 15 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #91 (Y: 16 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #92 (Y: 15 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #93 (Y: 15 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #94 (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Vote #302 (Y: 108 N: 53 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #86 (Y: 16 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #87 (Y: 16 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #88 (Y: 16 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #89 (Y: 14 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #90 (Y: 15 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #91 (Y: 16 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #92 (Y: 15 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #93 (Y: 15 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #94 (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-04-21 | Act 24 | |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2015-03-25 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Hopper |