GA SB133 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to provide for modernization and updates; to amend various provisions of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated for purposes of conformity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; modernization and updates; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #371 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #286 (Y: 171 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #89 (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #90 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Vote #286 (Y: 171 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #89 (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #90 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-02 | Act 140 | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-22 | House | House Postponed |
2019-03-21 | House | House Postponed |
2019-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |