GA SB137 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-86 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to special license plates promoting and supporting certain beneficial projects, agencies, funds, or nonprofit corporations, so as to establish a specialty license plate to benefit Tuskegee University; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Tuskegee University; specialty license plate; establish
Sponsors
Sen. David Lucas [D] | Sen. Freddie Sims [D] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Sen. Horacena Tate [D] |
Sen. Steve Henson [D] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Rep. Al Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - House Vote #263 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #78 (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #78 (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 284 | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |