GA SB138 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend the Official Code of Georgia Annotated so as to provide certain benefits to disabled first responders; to amend Article 3 of Chapter 2 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., so as to provide for a free license plate for certain disabled first responders; to amend Code Section 48-5C-1 of the O.C.G.A., relating to alternative ad valorem tax on motor vehicles; to amend Code Section 48-7-27 of the O.C.G.A., relating to computation of net income, so as to exempt disability payments to certain disabled first responders from state income tax; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Disabled First Responders; certain benefits; provide
Sponsors
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. Freddie Sims [D] | Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #396 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #338 (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #134 (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #159 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #338 (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #134 (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #159 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 283 | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |