GA SB140 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 13 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the World War I Centennial Commission, so as to extend the sunset provision; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
World War I Centennial Commission; sunset provisions; extend
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - House - House Vote #271 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #100 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #100 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 261 | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |