GA SB142 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 24 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance generally, so as to require that a statement indicating that the subscriber's health policy is fully insured is included on a subscriber's health insurance identification card; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; statement indicating that the subscriber's health policy is fully insured is included on a subscriber's health insurance identification card; require
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Lester Jackson [D] |
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #358 (Y: 155 N: 3 NV: 14 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #398 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #101 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #398 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #101 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 282 | |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-04-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-29 | House | House Postponed |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |