GA SB146 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to alcoholic beverages, so as to provide that retail package liquor stores may conduct tasting events at which samples of alcoholic beverages may be served; to provide for definitions; to provide for terms and conditions of tasting events; to provide for the remission of taxes applicable to tasting events; to provide for the promulgation of rules and regulations by the state revenue commissioner; to specify that manufacturers and wholesalers may provide samples of alcoholic beverages to retail dealers under certain conditions; to revise provisions for purposes of conformity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages; retail package liquor stores conduct tasting events; samples of alcoholic beverages may be served; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] |
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #121 (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |