GA SB149 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to registration and licensing of motor vehicles generally, so as to permit the owner or operator of a vehicle which has a valid number license plate without the required revalidation decal affixed to the plate to retain custody of the vehicle under certain conditions; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor Vehicles; retain custody of the vehicle under certain conditions; valid number license plate without required revalidation decal affixed; permit
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Marty Harbin [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #473 (Y: 24 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #308 (Y: 160 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #79 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #308 (Y: 160 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #79 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-25 | House | House Postponed |
2019-03-22 | House | House Postponed |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-13 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |