GA SB15 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Veto V7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 27 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to loitering at or disrupting schools, so as to require public and private schools to have performed certain threat assessments; to amend Article 9 of Chapter 3 of Title 35 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Georgia Information Sharing and Analysis Center, so as to provide for the center's role in preventing, discovering, responding to, and recovering from threats, warnings, and developing situations regarding any public or private school; to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to property tax exemptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Keeping Georgia's Schools Safe Act"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #420 (Y: 110 N: 56 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #434 (Y: 42 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #69 (Y: 47 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Veto V7
2019-05-10SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-09SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2019-04-02SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2019-04-02HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-04-02HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-27SenateSenate Third Read
2019-02-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-01-16SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-01-15SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback