GA SB159 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to provide for the operation of motorized mobility devices; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor Vehicles and Traffic; operation of motorized mobility devices; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] |
Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #454 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |