GA SB162 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to local government, so as to provide for disaster mitigation improvements and broadband services infrastructure in projects of downtown development authorities and development authorities; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local Government; disaster mitigation improvements and broadband services infrastructure; downtown development authorities; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #160 (Y: 39 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-06-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |