GA SB17 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ethics in government, as to increase filing fees and fines for campaign disclosure reports, financial disclosure statements, and lobbyist disclosure reports that are filed late; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Election; increase filing fees/fines for campaign, financial, and lobbyist disclosure reports that are filed late
Sponsors
Sen. Seth Harp [R] | Sen. George Hooks [D] | Sen. Eric Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #808 - Agree To House Amendment As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #206 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #206 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-10 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-04 | Act 680 | |
2010-06-04 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-21 | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate | |
2010-04-21 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-21 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2010-03-26 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-18 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-17 | House First Readers | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-02-18 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-02-17 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-14 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-01-06 | Senate Prefile |