GA SB175 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-08 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 3 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to retirement allowances, disability benefits, and spouses' benefits, so as to require certain public employers to make employer and employee contributions to the Teachers Retirement System of Georgia for employed beneficiaries; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Teachers Retirement System of Georgia; certain public employers to make employer and employee contributions; require
Sponsors
Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] |
Sen. Gail Davenport [D] | Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #124 (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |