GA SB176 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 37 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to administration of mental health, developmental disabilities, addictive diseases, and other disability services, so as to remove a cross-reference; to amend Chapter 2 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Employees' Retirement System of Georgia, so as to require certain public employers to make employer and employee contributions to the Employees' Retirement System of Georgia on behalf of retired members employed by such employers either directly or indirectly; to remove a cross-reference; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Employees' Retirement System of Georgia; certain public employers; make employer and employee contribution on behalf of retired members; require
Sponsors
Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] |
Sen. Gail Davenport [D] | Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] | Rep. Tom Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - House Vote #657 (Y: 150 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #125 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #125 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 510 | |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-17 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-17 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-18 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |