GA SB18 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 38 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the State Defense Force, so as to remove the restrictions regarding the right of public officers and employees to be absent for service on the State Defense Force and regarding reemployment rights of persons after service on the State Defense Force; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Defense Force; rights of public officers, employees; remove restrictions
Sponsors
Sen. Judson Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Senate Recommitted | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-02-01 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-01-26 | Senate Read and Referred |