GA SB18 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 35-5-7 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to security police force within the Georgia Public Safety Training Center, so as to provide that any member of the security police force, upon his or her retirement or upon leaving such employment as a result of a disability arising in the line of duty, shall be entitled to retain his or her weapon and badge under certain conditions; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Public Safety Training Center; any member of security police force; retain his/her weapon and badge under certain conditions
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] |
Sen. Lee Anderson [R] | Sen. Michael Williams [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - House Vote #288 (Y: 148 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #43 (Y: 23 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #44 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #43 (Y: 23 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #44 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-04-18 | Act 20 | |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Senate Hopper |