GA SB188 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 33-7-14 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to reinsurance of risks, so as to provide adequate regulation of reinsurers; to provide for the incorporation of the National Association of Insurance Commissioners reinsurance model law into the Georgia Insurance Code; to provide domestic ceding insurers credit as either an asset or a deduction in liability on account of reinsurance purchased only when the purchase meets new requirements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Reinsurance of Risks; adequate regulation of reinsurers; incorporation of the National Association of Insurance Commissioners reinsurance model into the Georgia Insurance Code; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] |
Sen. Marty Harbin [R] | Rep. Noel Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #670 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House Vote #645 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #128 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House Vote #645 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #128 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-30 | Act 408 | |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2020-06-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |